This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 10:22:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS HAGGARD

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAGGARD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0087

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

HAGGARD, MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TULPULE, MANASI A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/17/202012:43 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.