Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:16 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O LOVE, JIM VS RENDON

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O LOVE, JIM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENDON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0460

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O LOVE, JIM

Defendant

RENDON, JACOB COLBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA, RUDOLFO

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Minute Order - OSC 3.110 - 10/30/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Jacob Colby Rendon personal service 4/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Dismissal of unserved parties pursuant to crc rule 3.110b (cont'd from 10/30/15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: For the Gaba Law Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: On behlaf of Mid Century Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Notice of Order to Appear - Comment: and Show Cause why this matter should not be dismissed pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 (b) scheduled for 1/04/2016 at 8:30 a.m. in department 4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Minute Order - OSC 3.110 - 10/30/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less