This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 07:55:06 (UTC).

MICHAEL SHINAULT DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 MICHAEL SHINAULT DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2774

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHINAULT, PATRICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAKE, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Petition for Spousal Property

Petition for Spousal Property 10/14/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTES - 1. Need list of all known creditors of businesses and amounts owed to each - PrC 13658 2. Need confirmation that businesses are unincorporated PrC 13651(a)(2) 3. Need copy of partnership/operating agreement for Shinault Baker & Company

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Spousal Property - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Spousal Property - Petition for Spousal Property 10/14/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTES - 1. Need list of all known creditors of businesses and amounts owed to each - PrC 13658 2. Need confirmation that businesses are unincorporated PrC 13651(a)(2) 3. Need copy of partnership/operating agreement for Shinault Baker & Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Shinault Estate; Supplement 10-11-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPetition Spousal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAKE, STEPHEN M