This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 01:41:01 (UTC).

MICHAEL EARL LE MON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/19/2015 MICHAEL EARL LE MON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2034

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LE MON, BARBARA L

Decedents

MICHAEL E. LE MON

LE MON, MICHAEL EARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GELBER, JAMIE P

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 06/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Second and final report of adm...returned via SASE

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 12/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTE - As of 11/19/18, new 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Second status report...returned via file & serve

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 05/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

5/4/17 MO: Hearing on Status Report PC 12200: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Petition

7/21/16 MO: Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Petition for Probate of Will

Amended MO Probate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE- 1. Need to state if decedents address is in the unincorporated area of Lake Isabella in order to publish in the Kern River Courier.

Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Petition for Letters of Special Admin MO 060415: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. Need proof of service to park manager Debra Gifford.; Parties Present Petitioner: LE MON, BARBARA L; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt of costs reimbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketFinal Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order on second and final account of administrator with will annexed on waiver of account and waiver of statutory compensation to administrator and attorney, for reimbursement of costs advanced by family member, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 06/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: RE: FIRST STATUS REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 6/26/19 at 8:30 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Comment: Second and final report of administrator with Will annexed on waiver of account and waiver of statutory compensation to administrator and attorney for reimbursement of costs advanced by attorney and family member, and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketAllowance Or Rejection Of Creditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketAllowance Or Rejection Of Creditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Second and final report of adm...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Petition for Letters of Special Admin MO 060415: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. Need proof of service to park manager Debra Gifford.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Order - Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.; Comment: Order authorizing Ex-Parte hearing on petition for appointment of Special Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration in support of ex-parte hearing on petition for appointment of special administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Application for ex-parte hearing on petition for appointment of special administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Holographic Instrument

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Holographic Instrument

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters of Administration - Comment: with Will Annexed Petition for probate of will and for letters of administration with will annexed authorization to administer under the independent administration of estates act with full authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.