Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:19:50 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ARMENDARIZ-MARROQUIN

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARMENDARIZ-MARROQUIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1023

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ARMENDARIZ-MARROQUIN, ABIEJOEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES, TODD F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: ARMENDARIZ-MARROQUIN, ABIEJOEL; Amount; Damages: $14,885.01; Pre-Judgment Interest: $959.17; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $437.00; Total: $16281.18; Party: Names: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; ARMENDARIZ-MARROQUIN, ABIEJOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Partial Satisfaction - Comment: As to Abieljoel Armendriz-Marroquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Abstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: as to Tricia Mieloszyk in lieu of testimony in support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Prejudgment Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Request for Court Judgment - Comment: as to ABIELJOEL ARMENDARIZ-MARROQUIN, an individual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to Abieljoel Armendariz-Marroquin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Abieljoel Armendariz-Marroquin, an individual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY TODD F. HAINES

    Read MoreRead Less