This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:48:58 (UTC).

MESA VS DIAMOND WELL SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 MESA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DIAMOND WELL SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0453

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA, RICK

Defendant

DIAMOND WELL SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUMPH, RANDY M

Defendant Attorney

EGLAND, TERRENCE T

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order- Case Management Conference 1/12/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RUMPH, RANDY M; Defendant; Attorney: EGLAND, TERRENCE T

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketJury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Minute Order- Case Management Conference 1/12/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: On behalf of Rick Mesa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Randy Rumph, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketJury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Filed by T Todd Egland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: On behalf of Diamond Well Service Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: New Address 218 H Street Bakersfield, Ca 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Diamond Well Service, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MESA, RICK; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less