This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/12/2020 at 19:48:58 (UTC).

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION VS PIROSKA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 MERRICK BANK CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PIROSKA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0215

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

Defendants

PIROSKA, KATHERINE G

PIROSKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; Awarded Against: PIROSKA, KATHERINE G; Amount; Damages: $1,162.97; Costs: $284.50; Total: $1447.47; Party: Names: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; PIROSKA, KATHERINE G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less