Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:07 (UTC).

Mercury Insurance Company VS Figueroa, Jr., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 Mercury Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Figueroa, Jr . This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0102

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercury Insurance Company

Defendants

Escalante, Rich

Escalante, Julie

Figueroa, Jr., Ernie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS, MARK R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: ERNIE FIGUEROA, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: RICH ESCALANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: JULE ESCALANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less