Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 15:28:58 (UTC).

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY VS PULTE HOMES

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PULTE HOMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0421

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PULTE HOMES, INC.

PULTE HOME CORPORATION, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

PULTE HOMES, INC., DBA PULTE CORPORATION

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC. FKA SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC. DBA PARAGON SCHMID BUILDING PRODUCTS

MON-MAY ENTERPRISES, INC.

TRI-VALLEY MECHANICAL, INC.

CALIFORNIA PLASTERING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKSON, JEROME MARK

WILLIAMS, JASON PAUL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SHANER, STEPHANIE ANNE

Cross Defendant Attorney

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason P. Williams Document: Request for Dismissal (E-filed #537871) Must include signature of attorney for cross-complaint.

Ruling

Minute Order: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

06/13/16 MO ; Motion to Dismiss / Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Specially set to be heard with L&M Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WILLIAMS, JASON PAUL; Defendant; Attorney: SHANER, STEPHANIE ANNE; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SHANER, STEPHANIE ANNE

Case Management Conference

4/18/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WILLIAMS, JASON PAUL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E: 3 DYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/D: 03/13/17 T/E: 3 DYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 3 DAYS FCMC 3/3/17 TD 3/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Motion for Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 10/28/16 Defendant, PULTE HOME CORPORATION Motion for Summary Judgment ResID: 17470

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Dismissal with prejudice entered on 12/20/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Dismissal entered December 20, 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason P. Williams Document: Request for Dismissal (E-filed #537871) Must include signature of attorney for cross-complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 11/7/16 Defendant, PULTE HOME CORPORATION, a Michigan Corporation Motion to Compel Further Responses from Mercury Casualty Company ResID: 18300

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2016
  • Motion to Dismiss - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 3/29/16 Defendant, PULTE HOME CORPORATION, a Michigan Corporation Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer ResID: 15646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - 4/18/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WILLIAMS, JASON PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: To continue motion to dismiss in lieu of answer & case management conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Jason P Williams, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Edward W Schmitt Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer Hearing Date: 4/25/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Jerome M Jackson, Esq. New Attorney: Jason P. Williams, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing - Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER IN AND CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Reclassification - Transfer In

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Records Received - Comment: TRANSFER IN FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ORANGE, PREVIOUS CASE NUMBER 30-2015-00811528-CU-IC-CJC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI VALLEY MECHANICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PLASTERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MON-MAY ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant