Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 10:46:22 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES VS HUNDAL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HUNDAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1991

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC

Defendant

HUNDAL, SAWRAJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARKOON, ANNA CHAPLAIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Sawraj Hundal, 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARKOON ANNA C