This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:42:49 (UTC).

MERCADO VS BAUTISTA (B)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 MERCADO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BAUTISTA B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1910

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MERCADO, ERIKA

Respondents

BAUSTISTA, RUBEN

BAUTISTA, RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 11/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 9/18/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: STATUS: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 11/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 9/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 09/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/15/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 09/18/18 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less