This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 08:56:00 (UTC).

MENDOZA VS CURIEL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 MENDOZA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CURIEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2224

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENDOZA, MARTHA

Respondent

CURIEL, RICARDO MEZA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketTo ensure the public has access to court proceedings - Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 10/14/20. TRO GRANTED. COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT ACKNOWLEDGES POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (CH-250) - Comment: AS TO MARTHA MENDOZA ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Restraining Order (CH-120) - Comment: AS TO MARTHA MENDOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketTo ensure the public has access to court proceedings - Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Richardo Meza Curiel , personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: **GRANTED** 3 yard stay away orders issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: HRG: 10/14/2020 @8:30AM IN DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MENDOZA, MARTHA, CURIEL, RICARDO MEZA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: CLETS INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less