This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 16:48:09 (UTC).

MENDEZ VS MENDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/02/2015 MENDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MENDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Copelan, James, Benavides, Jose R., Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L., Compton, James L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1047

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Copelan, James

Benavides, Jose R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Compton, James L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENDEZ, ANTONIO

Respondent

MENDEZ, GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RUBIO, NIEVES

Attorney at LAW OFC NIEVES RUBIO

1615 "V" St

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Respondent Attorneys

LEON, DAVID F

KATES DAVIS, KATHE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

07/05/2016 MO: RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Respondent's request for Attorney fees and cost

Court Trial

**MO - Public 2/17/2016 COURT TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EST TIME 30 MINS; Parties Present Petitioner: MENDEZ, ANTONIO; Respondent: MENDEZ, GLORIA

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MO 11/19/15 MSC: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 11/12/15

Review

Original Type: Review; RESP CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT CONTINUANCE: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESP C/C C/V C/S S/S HOME APPRAISAL ATT F/C

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MO - 11/12/15: Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Respondent: MENDEZ, GLORIA

Review

REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESP CC CV CS SS HOME APPRAISAL ATT FC

Review

RESP CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD/SPOUSAL SUPPORT CONTINUANCE: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESP CC CV CS SS HOME APPRAISAL ATT FC

Review

RESP REVIEW CONTINUANCE: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESP REVIEW CONT'D FROM 8/1915

Review

REVIEW m/o: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESP REVIEW; Parties Present Petitioner: MENDEZ, ANTONIO; Respondent: MENDEZ, GLORIA

Request for Order - Respondent

M.O. RESP RFO REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES REVIEW; Parties Present Petitioner: MENDEZ, ANTONIO; Respondent: MENDEZ, GLORIA

Request for Order - Respondent

M.O. RFO 5/11/2015: Judicial Officer: Copelan, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RESP C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C HOME APPRAISAL1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: MENDEZ, ANTONIO; Respondent: MENDEZ, GLORIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketOrder/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: TERMINATION OF IWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Wage Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Address Verification Post Judgment (FL-334)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Joinder Employee Benefit Plan (EBP) and Order - Comment: CLAIMANT: CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY 401(K) RETIREMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketPleading on Joinder-Employee Pension Benefit Plan - Comment: CLAIMANT: CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY 401(K) RETIREMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: CLAIMANT: CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY 401(K) RETIREMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES HRG DATE: 5/11/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Docket171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 - Comment: Amount of $85.00 for MENDEZ, GLORIA (RE-1). Received from MENDEZ, GLORIA, check no(s) 8103. Receipt #833479 for amount of $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Docket806U Pmt: First Appearance Family Law GC 70670(D) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MENDEZ, GLORIA (RE-1). Received from MENDEZ, GLORIA, check no(s) 8102. Receipt #833389 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketResponse - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MENDEZ, ANTONIO (PE-1). Received from MENDEZ, ANTONIO, check no(s) 1479. Receipt #816626 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.