This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:26 (UTC).

MEJIA DIAZ VS MEJIA (C)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 MEJIA DIAZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEJIA C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Gill, Susan M. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4049

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEJIA DIAZ, BIANCA

Respondent

MEJIA, JORGE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES:$605.00

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 06/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 01/29/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONT FROM 03/12/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 03/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 1/29/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/27/18 PET MOD C/C C/V 3 MINORS

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 PET MOD C/C C/V CONSOLIDATE CASES 3 MINORS NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: MEJIA DIAZ, BIANCA; Respondent: MEJIA, JORGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: STATUS 3/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver After Reconsideration - Ended - 10 Days - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: TOTAL FEES DUE: $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES:$605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice To Appear For Reconsideration Of Fee Waiver (FW-011)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 04/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 PET MOD C/C C/V CONSOLIDATE CASES 3 MINORS NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.