This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:47:48 (UTC).

MEEKS VS MEEKS (B)

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 MEEKS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEEKS B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven, Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K., Cannon, Gloria, Bittleston, Dawn and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1680

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Cannon, Gloria

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEEKS, KARA M.

Respondent

MEEKS, ANTHONY J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STANLEY, HEATHER J C

KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

THOMAS, EDWARD J

Respondent Attorneys

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

BYNUM, STEVEN L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 06/21/16 RES MOD C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 01/26/17 5/01/17 5/02/17; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner/Respondent 05/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V C/S S/S 2 MINORS T.E. 2 HRS CONT'D FORM 01/26/17 5/01/17; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES MOD C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS **STATUS CONF ONLY** CONT'D FROM 11/10/16 12/2/16 1/26/17 RE-SET TO 3/15/17; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 12/2/16; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/30/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/S S/S ATTY F/C RET OF FORD-100 STMT OF DEC 2 MINORS DOD?? COUNSEL ONLY; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/23/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: C/S S/S ATTY F/C RET OF FORD-100 STMT OF DEC 2 MINORS DOD?? ***TO BE HEARD AT 1:30PM****; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Respondent

REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, - Public: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP RESTRAINT STMNT OF DEC CONT FROM 12/07/15; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/16/2015: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP RES PROP CONT STATEMENT OF DECISION OTHER RELIEF 2 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Ex Parte Hearing

MO RE EXPARTE CONTD: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V PROP RES PROP CONT 2 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner/Respondent 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V C/S S/S 2 MINORS T.E. 2 HRS CONT'D FORM 01/26/17 5/01/17 5/02/17; Parties Present Petitioner: MEEKS, KARA M.; Respondent: MEEKS, ANTHONY J.; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Respondent 05/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V C/S S/S 2 MINORS T.E. 2 HRS CONT'D FORM 01/26/17

Court Trial

11/10/16REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT/Petitioner/Court Trial: Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: IMPUTATION OF EARNINGS RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT CONTD FROM 10/21/16

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - (2) Respondent/Petitioner 09/23/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT FROM 7/29/16; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner/Respondent 08/31/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT FROM 7/29/16

Request for Order - Petitioner

07/29/16 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C RETURN OF FORD F-100, STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 4/18/16 06/22/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MEEKS, KARA M.; Respondent: MEEKS, ANTHONY J.; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Petitioner

06/22/16 MO PETITIONER CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT, ATTORNEY FEES, COST, RETURN OF FORD F-100, ST: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/S S/S ATTY F/C FORD STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 4/18/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MEEKS, KARA M.; Respondent: MEEKS, ANTHONY J.; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Respondent

REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP RES PROP CONT STATEMENT OF DECISION OTHER RELIEF 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 09/6/15; Parties Present Petitioner: MEEKS, KARA M.; Respondent: MEEKS, ANTHONY J.; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Respondent

RESP RFO M/O: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP RES PROP CONT STATEMENT OF DECISION OTHER RELIEF 2 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: RE: DISPERSEMENT OF RETIREMENT ACCOUNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS 10/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RETURNED VIA ATTY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RETURNED TO ATTORNEY EDWARD J. THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: res ex parte c/c, c/v, prop res prop cont 2 minors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Comment: STEPHANIE CHILDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Comment: GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES C/C C/V STATEMENT OF DECISION PROPERTY ORDERS 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - MO - EX PARTE: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C, C/V, PROP RES , PROP CONT 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/18/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - MO RE EXPARTE CONTD: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V PROP RES PROP CONT 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 8/18/15 Hearing Time: 11:00 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less