This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 03:46:21 (UTC).

MEEKS FAMILY TRUST, PATRICIA LOU MEEKS AND THOMAS FRANKLIN MEEKS JR.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 MEEKS FAMILY TRUST, PATRICIA LOU MEEKS AND THOMAS FRANKLIN MEEKS JR was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2008

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOWELLS, ABBIE C

Not Classified By Court

MEEKS, PATRICIA LOU

MEEKS, THOMAS FRANKLIN

HOWELLS, JOSHUA T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GUERIN, REGIS A

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

JENNISON, PATRICK E

PEAKE, LARRY F

STOUT, TINA K

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Original Type: Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference 02/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GUERIN, REGIS A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING re: status of filing of petition/motion to move matter to arbitration COMMENTS: 1. Need confirmation that Robin Howells, aka Sawyer, was not survived by a spouse or notice to surviving spouse PC 17203(c) 2. Need proof of service of response to petition on Amanda Pitts; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GUERIN, REGIS A

Petition

Petition 03/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING Verified petition on Abbie C. Howells for: 1. Determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to confict of interest; 4. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5. Accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6. Appointment of receiver; and 7. Declaration relief and instructions to trustee.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GUERIN, REGIS A

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Supplement and check returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/24/2020, HEARING CONTINUED *** RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference 02/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 11/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 08/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING further case management conference re: verified petition of Abbie C. Howells for: 1) determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2) removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3) removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to conflict of interest; 4) removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5) accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6) appointment of receiver; and 7) declaratory relief and instructions to trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 05/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING re: status of filing of petition/motion to move matter to arbitration COMMENTS: 1. Need confirmation that Robin Howells, aka Sawyer, was not survived by a spouse or notice to surviving spouse PC 17203(c) 2. Need proof of service of response to petition on Amanda Pitts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of respondent's attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 03/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING Verified petition on Abbie C. Howells for: 1. Determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to confict of interest; 4. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5. Accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6. Appointment of receiver; and 7. Declaration relief and instructions to trustee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Response to petition of Abbie C. Howells and request to dismiss petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Supplement and check returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Verified petition on Abbie C. Howells for: 1. Determination and construction of trust and for court supervision of trust and trustee; 2. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of fiduciary duty; 3. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of the duty of impartiality, loyalty and due to confict of interest; 4. Removal of trustee and damages for breach of trust and fraud; 5. Accounting and surcharge of trustee for bad faith defense of purported accounting; 6. Appointment of receiver; and 7. Declaration relief and instructions to trustee.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOUT, TINA K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEAKE, LARRY F