This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:16:38 (UTC).

MEDINA VS MEDINA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 MEDINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEDINA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2503

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDINA, AARON

Respondent

MEDINA, PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WINKLER, B SCOTT

Other Attorneys

WILSON, LARRY G

1508 18Th St #308

Bakersfield, CA 93301

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous Filing

4/06/16 HRG: Guideline Calculation Results Summary: Comment: Guideline Calculation Results Summary

Motion (DCSS)

04/06/16 MO: MOTION (DCSS) RE: JUDGMENT: 4/06/16 HRG: Guideline Calculation Results Summary: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STD ORDERS 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: MEDINA, AARON; Respondent: MEDINA, PATRICIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Ex Parte Application & Order - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: EX PARTE APP TO CLERICAL ERROR ON JUDGMENT & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Larry G. Wilson - New Attorney: in Pro-Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Filing - 4/06/16 HRG: Guideline Calculation Results Summary: Comment: Guideline Calculation Results Summary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DCSS: Advisement of Rights Pursuant to FC 4251(b)(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion (DCSS) - 04/06/16 MO: MOTION (DCSS) RE: JUDGMENT: 4/06/16 HRG: Guideline Calculation Results Summary: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STD ORDERS 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: MEDINA, AARON; Respondent: MEDINA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS 3MINORS Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Supplemental Summons / Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2013
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • NP1085 - Comment: Department: AD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CASE CONSOLIDATION AND CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: AARON MEDINA (PE-1) APPEARS WITH LARRY G WILSON. PATRICIA MEDINA (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER D-1503-FL-502488 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER D-1503-FL-502503 WITH CASE NUMBER D-1503-FL-502503 BEING THE LEAD CASE. CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD(REN) OF THE PARTIES: AUBREY MEDINA (DOB: 4/10/97), VERONICA MEDINA (DOB:2/06/06) AND FELIX MEDINA (2/11/10) JOINT LEGAL/JOINT PHYSICAL WITH PRIMARY CUSTODY AWARDED TO PATRICIA MEDINA (RE-1) WITH THE RIGHT OF REASONABLE VISITATION AWARDED TO THE OTHER PARTY. MEDIATION AGREEMENT ON FILE HEREIN MADE AN ORDER OF THE COURT. PARTIES ARE ALLOWED TO BE FLEXIBLE WITH DATES, TIMES AND DURATION OF VISITATION AS MUTUALLY AGREED BY THE PARTIES. LARRY WILSON TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MEDINA, AARON (PE-1). Received from ATTY WILSON, check no(s) 1620. Receipt #709592 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Receipt #709427 entered by Deputy #694 on 3/27/2013 in the amount of $435.00 voided due to CHECK AMOUNTS NOT EQUAL; voided by Deputy #213 on 3/28/2013 at 8:15 AM with void transaction #709458.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • UCCJEA - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MEDINA, AARON (PE-1). Received from ATTORNEY LARRY WILSON, check no(s) 1620. Receipt #709427 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 694

    Read MoreRead Less