This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:53:24 (UTC).

MEDINA VS MEDINA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 MEDINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEDINA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Compton, James L. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1642

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Compton, James L.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDINA, RAUL

Respondent

MEDINA, DALIA

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Original Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; PET RFO CUSTODY, VISITATION DROPPED: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS NO SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Original Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; PET RFO CUSTODY, VISITATION DROPPED: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Neither Party Appeared for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Mediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Responsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 08/14/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 08/14/2015 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less