This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 12:54:13 (UTC).

MEDINA, Jr. VS TOOR

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MEDINA, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOOR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA, RAUL, Jr.

Defendants

TOOR, AJWINDER SINGH

SMARTWAY DISTRUBUTION SERVICE

SMARTWAY DISTRIBUTION SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAHLIN, RUSSELL C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Continued from 04/20/2020 by Standing Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Smartway Distribution Service via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Ajwinder Singh Toor via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: BCV-19-103333 National Liability & Fire Insurance Company v. Smartway Distribution Service Inc., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/19/20202:33 PM; Served: 03/19/20202:33 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.