This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:26:32 (UTC).

MEDEIROS VS GLEGHORN, Jr. (D)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MEDEIROS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GLEGHORN, Jr D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Louie, Chad A. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4152

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Louie, Chad A.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDEIROS, HANNAH

Respondent

GLEGHORN, BILLY, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/24/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 6/14/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 1 MINOR

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 01/17/19 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S PROP RSTRNT 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 2/07/19 *1

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 02/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 01/17/19 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S PROP RSTRNT 1 MINOR

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 10/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 8/30/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 1 MINOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMotion (DCSS) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: 01/14/20 DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE $0 SUPPORT 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/24/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDERS INTERVENE $0 SUPPORT 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 04/10/20 Hearing Time: 8:00AM Hearing Department/Division:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FOAH HRG 6/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 6/14/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: HRG 06/06/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG 7/26/19 DIV. D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 01/17/19 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S PROP RSTRNT 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 2/07/19 *1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: HRG 6/6/2019 DIV. D

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: SUZANNE HULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 10/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 8/30/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 10/9/18 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less