This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 09:52:07 (UTC).

MEDE VS MEDE

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 MEDE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MEDE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Webster, Jason W. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0078

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDE, MATTHEW WILSON

Respondent

MEDE, MELVIN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

STEIN, ROGER I

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 05/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Ruling

Ruling 04/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 04/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketResponse to Temporary Restraining Order - Comment: RESPONSE TO DVRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 05/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 04/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing) - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.