This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:17:09 (UTC).

MEARS VS MEARS (D)

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 MEARS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEARS D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Benavides, Jose R., Compton, James L., Fielder, John L. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3018

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Benavides, Jose R.

Compton, James L.

Fielder, John L.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEARS, JOANNA LEE

Respondent

MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEON, DAVID F

Respondent Attorneys

CLOUD, BOBBY L

KATES DAVIS, KATHE

 

Court Documents

Court Trial

Court Trial 03/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial; Parties Present Petitioner: MEARS, JOANNA LEE; Respondent: MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/17/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Comment: CONT'D FROM 9/22/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MEARS, JOANNA LEE; Respondent: MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

Review

Review: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: REVIEW C/S S/S CONT'D FROM 7/21/16 9/22/16 **MSC CAL ALSO** *6; Parties Present Petitioner: MEARS, JOANNA LEE; Respondent: MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

Review

Review 09/22/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW C/S S/S CONT FROM 07/21 *MSC CAL ALSO*

Mandatory Settlement Conference

07/21/16 MO: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: TIME EST: 4 HRS CONT'D FROM 5/19/16

Review

07/21/2016 MO: REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ALCOHOL/DRUG TESTING CONT FROM 05/25 **MSC CAL ALSO**

Mandatory Settlement Conference

5/19/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: EST TIME 4 HRS; Parties Present Petitioner: MEARS, JOANNA LEE; Respondent: MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Continuance 2/16/2016 PET CUSTODY, VISITATION,CHILD/SPOUSAL SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C ALCOHOL

Ex Parte Hearing

**MO - Public PET EX PARTE VISITATION: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/V DRUG TESTING 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: MEARS, JOANNA LEE; Respondent: MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

Ex Parte Hearing

PET EXPARTE RE CUSTODY, VISITATION: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 11/13/15; Parties Present Respondent: MEARS, NICHOLAS CHRISTOPHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: SUBPOENA RECORDS CHECK IN / CHECK OUT SLIP WITH DISPOSED RECORDS PER NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted - Comment: RECORDS DESTROYED - BAKERSFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Registration of California Support Order - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: LEBEAU-THELEN LLP 401(K) PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: *TO BE HEARD @ 1:30*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HALF DAY TRIAL SET 8/2/17 1:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: ATTORNEY BOBBY CLOUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: ATTORNEY DAVID LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSubpoenaed Records Received - Comment: CALIFORNIA IVY LEAGUE PRPARATORY ACADEMY HRG: 12/17/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: GRANTED WITH MODIFICATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C ALCOHOL TESTING 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - PET EXPARTE RE CUSTODY, VISITATION: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 11/13/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Comment: PET EX-PARTE C/C C/V ALCOHOL TESTING 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 11/13/15 Hearing Time: 1100 Hearing Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.