This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 09:46:35 (UTC).

MCVEAN ET AL VS TEJON RANCH COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 MCVEAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TEJON RANCH COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2499

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCVEAN, BRYAN

MCVEAN, TAMI

MCVEAN, CARSON

Defendants

TEJON RANCH COMPANY

TEJON RANCH

CENTENNIAL LIVESTOCK

WOOD AG MANAGEMENT, INC.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

LABARBERA, CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL OFFICER DUSTYN K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLOYD, JENNIFER C

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Jennifer C. Floyd RE: Summons REASON: does not conform to Complaint

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/08/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 10

Ruling

Ruling 12/01/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to WOOD AG MANAGEMENT, INC., via sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to CENTENNIAL LIVESTOCK, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL OFFICE DUSTYN K. LABARBERA, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to STATE OF CALIFORNIA, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 12/01/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to TEJON RANCH COMPANY, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to TEJON RANCH, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons Returned via E-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Comment: Appointing Bryan McVean as Guardian Ad Litem of Carson McVean, a minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/24/20219:59 AM; Served: 11/24/20219:59 AM; Served: 11/29/20213:15 PM; Served: 11/29/20214:30 PM; Served: 11/24/202110:31 AM; Served: 11/24/202110:31 AM; Served: 11/24/202110:31 AM; Served: 11/24/202110:31 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/08/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Jennifer C. Floyd RE: Summons REASON: does not conform to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEJON RANCH CO., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLOYD, JENNIFER C