This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 23:03:55 (UTC).

MCTAGGART VS HAZEL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2015 MCTAGGART filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAZEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4752

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCTAGGART, MATTHEW

RITCHIE, LOGAN

Defendants

HAZEL, BECKY

HAZEL, JOHN FLETCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Statement

12/28/2015: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

01/05/2016: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Case Consolidated - Child Case; Comment: LEAD CASE IS CV-284717**DO NOT MAKE ANY ENTRIES**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 11; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 11; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketFile Type: 4153 Case Management Conference; Comment: Hearing Entered.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - HAZEL, BECKY|DEFENDANT - HAZEL, JOHN FLETCHER|PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW|PLAINTIFF - RITCHIE, LOGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration and Order; Comment: For Continuance of Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause is continued to 12/28/15 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 11.***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: FILED BY JONATHAN DOUGLASS, ESQ; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW|PLAINTIFF - RITCHIE, LOGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketFile Type: 4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110); Comment: Hearing Entered.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - HAZEL, BECKY|DEFENDANT - HAZEL, JOHN FLETCHER|PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW|PLAINTIFF - RITCHIE, LOGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: RETURNED VIA US MAIL AS A COURTESY, NO COPIES REC'D, NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW|PLAINTIFF - RITCHIE, LOGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 17, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 17, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketFile Type: 800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12); Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MCTAGGART, MATTHEW (PL-1). Received from SAN LUIS OBISPO LEGAL SERVICES, check no(s) 19092. Receipt #837735 for amount of $435.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created by deputy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Comment: FILED BY JONATHAN W. DOUGLASS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW|PLAINTIFF - RITCHIE, LOGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint - Fast Track; Comment: FILED BY JONATHAN W. DOUGLASS CMC SET 11/2/2015 AT 8:30AM DEPT 11; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MCTAGGART, MATTHEW|PLAINTIFF - RITCHIE, LOGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less