This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:44:18 (UTC).

McNew VS SUMMIT HILLS 85, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 McNew filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUMMIT HILLS 85, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0023

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McNew, CAROL

McNew

Defendants

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

DAVID DOUGHERTY

SUMMIT HILLS MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC

SUMMIT HILLS 85, LLC

D & V SUMMIT HILLS LIMITED, LLC

THE POINTE AT SUMMIT HLLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL, CLAYTON D

Defendant Attorneys

KELLY, DANIEL J

CHURCH, RAYMA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: TE: 7 - 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: JURY: 07/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Filing Party: Deft Otis Elevator Company Motion to Compel Production of Documents Contact Person: Valeria 213-430-3400 CHECK FOR PAPERWORK: 7/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Filing Party: Deft Otis Elevator Company Motion to Compel Form and Special Interrogatories, Set one Contact Person: Valeria 213-430-3400 CHECK FOR PAPERWORK: 7/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendants Summit Hills Answer to the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/28/2020, by Defendant SUMMIT HILLS 85, LLC; SUMMIT HILLS MANAGEMENT; DAVID DOUGHERTY Motion to Set Aside Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 7/6/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10 - Valeria Golodnitska to Appear by Telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Pre-Cleared Reservation Expired; Comment: Filing Party: Defendant Motion to Set Aside Default Contact: Ashley - (209) 201-1353 Paperwork Due: 4/2/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Proof of Service By Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to D & V Summit Hills Limited, LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Summit Hills Management Company, LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Summit Hills 85, LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/10/202011:50 AM; Served: 01/10/202011:50 AM; Served: 01/10/202011:50 AM; Served: 01/10/202011:50 AM; Served: 01/10/202012:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: returned via e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less