This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:42:01 (UTC).

MCMURTRIE VS BIG LOTS STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 MCMURTRIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG LOTS STORES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0816

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMURTRIE, JULIANA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BIG LOTS STORES, INC., AN OHIO CORPORATION

SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MVP GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC., A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

NPR GLOBAL SOURCING, LLC

SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION

BIG LOTS STORES, INC.

MVP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MAX'S WHOLESALE IMPORT AND EXPORT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEDRISH, LAURA FRANK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BAZAZ, T GINA

WELLS, DAVID J

MACKEY, ROBERT THOMAS

TUCKER, TRACY

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MACKEY, ROBERT THOMAS

TUCKER, TRACY

KAHN, JAMES N

BERGSTEN, ROBERT T

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 8-1-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Please submit only one notice of settlement. There is a second copy attached.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 12/20/2017

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Aviel Dahan Document: Max's Wholesale Import and Export, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint Attach proof of service on opposing party.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/17/2017

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CROSS-COMPLAINT & SUMMONS: REJECT FILING FOR CORRECTIONS PER MICHELLE FROM MURCHISON & CUMMINS, LLP.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; 2ND REJECTION. NO CORRECTIONS MADE. SUMMON ON CROSS COMPLANT DOES NOT CONFORM. SUMMONS MUST MATCH CROSS COMPLAINT WORD FOR WORD.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: As to Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice on complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 10 days CFM/TD 10-1-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to the Cross-COmplaint of BIG LOTS STORES, INC. AND SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to the Cross-Complaint of NPR GLOBEL SOURCING, LLC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 7/12/18 Cross-Defendant, MAX'S WHOLESALE IMPORT AND EXPORT, INC. Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP 128.5, and Monetary Sanctions ResID: 31338

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: Cross Complaint (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint on behalf of MVP Group International,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: proof of service of summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: proof of service of summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/01/2017; Served: 05/11/2017; Served: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: proof of service of summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details Page 1 of 3

Print this page

Case # BCV-17-100816 - MCMURTRIE VS BIG LOTS STORES, INC. (Clark, Thomas S.) f

BCV-17-1 00816

i MCMURTRIE VS BIG LOTS STORES, INC. '. Clark, Thomas S.

{ Gina Bazaz ] Murchlson & Cumming, LLP

CAPITAL CORPORATION SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF KERN, BAKERSFIELD

CASE NO. BCV-17-100816

AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF BIG

LOTS STORES, INC. AND SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION FOR: Xl IMPLIED INDEMNITY; (2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; (3) TOTAL EQUITABLE giEDLElgFNITY; AND (4) DECLARATORY

Assigned to Hon. Thomas S. Clark, Dept. 17

Action Filed: April 18, 2017 Trial Date: None Set

JULIANA MCMURTRIE, an individual, Plaintiff,