This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:22 (UTC).

MCKNIGHT VS RAMIREZ-MCKNIGHT

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 MCKNIGHT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMIREZ-MCKNIGHT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Loo, Cynthia L. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4061

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCKNIGHT, TAWNNI

Respondent

RAMIREZ-MCKNIGHT, DOMINGO D

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: MCKNIGHT, TAWNNI

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulation/Agreement in Court (FL/DCSS); Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 7/2/19 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 10/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.