Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 19:13:18 (UTC).

MCHAM VS BOLLER (E)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 MCHAM filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BOLLER E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foley, Therese M. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3370

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foley, Therese M.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCHAM, TRISTEN DENISE

Respondent

BOLLER, MATHEW EUGENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/14/2020 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 11/2/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/14/2020 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL 1 MINOR *NO SERVICE*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEmergency Protective Order Received - Comment: EXP 11/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less