This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:51 (UTC).

MAZARIEGO VS GARRETT ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 MAZARIEGO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARRETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0914

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAZARIEGO, RAUL

Defendants

GARRETT, RONA

GARRETT, SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

10/7/15 Minute Order - Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15): Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Unlawful Detainer:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - 10/7/15 Minute Order - Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15): Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Held in Pro Per Bin "M"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MAZARIEGO, RAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 4311 Native Dancer Dr Bakersfield, CA 93312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less