This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/05/2020 at 10:15:32 (UTC).

MAYO VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/18/2005 MAYO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Wallace, Arthur E and Felice, Lee P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5548

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Wallace, Arthur E

Felice, Lee P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRACNER, JONNIE MAE

Defendants

ESTATE OF GLEN MICHAEL ELCANO DECEASED

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

GLENJEN FARMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKNIGHT, BENTON

Defendant Attorneys

ROBINSON, OLIVER U, Jr.

WINSLOW, PETER K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2008

Docket821 Pmt: Jury Forfeiture CCP 631.3 - Comment: Amount of $150.00 for STRACNER, JONNIE MAE (PL-3). Received from COUNTY OF KERN, check no(s) 17215521. Receipt #381858 for amount of $150.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2008

Docket821 Pmt: Jury Forfeiture CCP 631.3 - Comment: Amount of $150.00 for MAYO, ELISHA (PL-1). Received from COUNTY OF KERN, check no(s) 17215520. Receipt #381856 for amount of $150.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2008

DocketAccounting - Comment: Withdrawal of forfeiture of Jury fees of $150.00 completed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2006

DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: BENTON MCKNIGHT RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL XX Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL OF CASE PLACE 8/8/2006 IN WHICH CASE WAS DISMISSED AS TO ALL REMAINING CLAIMS IN ACTIONS 255548 AND 255808. COPY OF ORDER DISMISSING ACTIONS PROVIDED FOR YOUR REFERENCE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2006

DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Comment: The above-entitled cause came on regularly on AUGUST 8, 2006, in Department 6, before the Honorable SIDNEY P CHAPIN, pursuant to an Order to Appear to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 225. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all remaining claims in actions CV-255548 and CV- 255808. **CHAPIN**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2006

DocketNP4170 - Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 225. Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 225. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. *************************************************************************************** NO APPEARANCES. CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. TO EXTENT NOT PREVIOULSY DISMISSED, THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL REMAINING CLAIMS IN ACTIONS CV-255548 AND CV-255808.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2006

Docket4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Comment: New Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2006

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 225

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2006

DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO ATTORNEY BENTO F MCKNIGHT RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL MUST SPECIFY CASE NUMBER ON WHICH PARTY IS BEING DISMISSED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2006

DocketNotice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
118 More Docket Entries
06/24/2005

DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY GARY LOGAN ON BEHALF OF DEFT #2 VIA AMS 6/30/05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2005

DocketAmended Summons Issued - Comment: ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2005

DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RICHARD C WATTERS ON BEHALF OF PLTFS SUMMONS ISSUED DEFTS: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORATION; ESTATE OF GLEN MICHAEL ELCANO, DECEASED VIA FED EX PROVIDED BY PLTF ATTY 6/14/05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2005

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: RE:RULE 201.7 HEARING: 8-9-05 8:30 AM D-4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2005

DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: CMC SET FOR 11-17-05 8:00 AM D-4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2005

Docket150 Pmt: Overage GC 29375.1 - Comment: Amount of $3.00 for MAYO, ELISHA (PL-1). Received from MILES SEARS, check no(s) 24723. Receipt #170126 for amount of $3.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2005

Docket800E Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 26820.4 (1/1/05) - Comment: Amount of $292.50 for MAYO, ELISHA (PL-1). Received from MILES SEARS EANNI, check no(s) 24723. Receipt #170124 for amount of $292.50.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2005

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 34

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2005

DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2005

DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: PIM SUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less