This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:43 (UTC).

MAXINE JEANETTE RUSSELL BAKER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MAXINE JEANETTE RUSSELL BAKER DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2969

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRITCHARD, TERRY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, JOSHUA G

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 07/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 11/13/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Status Report PC 12200 - Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 07/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: 12200 status report or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 07/11/2019 @ 8:30 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketStatus Report - Comment: Status report of executrix Probate Code 12201(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 11/13/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketLetters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketWill Admitted - Comment: BRW-17-001252

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 11/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Confidential copy of driver's license

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less