This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:22 (UTC).

MATTHEWS VS DAVIS, Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 MATTHEWS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVIS, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1764

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATTHEWS, MEGAN MAXINE

Respondent

DAVIS, MICHAEL ANDRE, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 04/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: MATTHEWS, MEGAN MAXINE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 9/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 04/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 4/14/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.