This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 09:37:20 (UTC).

MATTHEWS VS 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 MATTHEWS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2052

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEWS, REBECCA DIANE

Defendant

99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGO, MICHAEL D

Defendant Attorney

RUEGER, BARBARA J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/17/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer(s): Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/10/202112:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/17/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUEGER, BARBARA J