This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:33 (UTC).

MATHEWS VS BRADEN PARTNERS, L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 MATHEWS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BRADEN PARTNERS, L P. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9001

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHEWS, BUFFY

Defendants

BRADEN PARTNERS, L P

PACIFIC PULMONARY SERVICES

BRADEN PARTNERS, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAINES, DANIEL F

Attorney at GAINES & GAINES PLC

21550 Oxnard St #980

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

KATOFSKY, ALEX P

HIRMAND, SEPIDEH

GAINES, KENNETH S

Defendant Attorney

KIENITZ, JOSHUA D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2015
  • Ruling - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • 839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $4.00 for MATHEWS, BUFFY (PL-1). Received from GAINES ESQ.. Receipt #750224 for amount of $4.00. Detail: FAX ID: 13205 09/05/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ~ calid=2204613 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:09/23/2013, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:GRICELDAE, SystemDate:4/24/2013 9:15:20 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF BUFFY MATHEWS INDIVIDUAL CLAIM AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL PUTATIVE CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE CLIAMS OF ALL ABSENT CALSS MEMBERS. FILED BY DANIEL F GAINES, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Electronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV279001_130905_161331 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL eFax document: FAX-13205.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: DANIEL F. GAINES RE: MATHEWS VS BRADEN PARTNERS, L. Case No. S-1500-CV-279001, SPC NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS XX The attached papers REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF BUFFY MATTHEWS AND DECLARATION OF DANIEL F. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE are being returned for the following reason(s) REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: USE MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNSIL FORM REVISED 1/1/2013, INCLUDED. COMPLETE NUMBER 2 ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: DANIEL F. GAINES RE: MATHEWS VS BRADEN PARTNERS, L. Case No. S-1500-CV-279001, SPC NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS XX The attached papers REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF BUFFY MATTHEWS AND DECLARATION OF DANIEL F. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE are being returned for the following reason(s) REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: USE MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNSIL FORM REVISED 1/1/2013, INCLUDED. COMPLETE NUMBER 2 ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • 801N First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BRADEN PARTNERS, L.P. (DE-1). Received from BRADEN PARTNERS, L.P., check no(s) 3221. Receipt #722723 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: DEFENDANT BRADEN PARTNERS L.P.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 7/10/13 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2204642 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/10/2013, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DRL, Deputy:GRICELDAE, SystemDate:4/24/2013 9:14:58 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: AS TO BRADEN PARTNERS, L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA PACIFIC PULMONARY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Notice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 7/10/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 9/23/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. . PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 7/10/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 9/23/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. . PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MATHEWS, BUFFY (PL-1). Received from ACTIVE LEGAL PROCESS SOLUTIONS, check no(s) 3234. Receipt #709625 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY ALEX P. KATOFSKY, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY ALEX P. KATOFSKY, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less