Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:37:50 (UTC).

MARY THERESA KOWALSKI DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 MARY THERESA KOWALSKI DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2681

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLEVINS, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOSTER, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER MAIL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER MAIL

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Paragraph 18 re total compensation request exceed statutory compensation per Probate Code 10800 and CRC 7.705. 2. Need waiver of account from trustee. 3. Need proposed distribution.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Waiver of accounting returned to attorney via mail

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NEW NOTE- 1. Proof of publication filed 01/29/18 does not include language re requesting Will to be admitted into probate. Need amended Proof of Publication.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOSTER, STEVEN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Original trust returned to attorney via mail

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing returned to attorney via mail

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Original Trust...returned via SASE

Petition for Probate of Will

09/14/2017 MO: Petition for Probate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Copy of Will not attached to petition. Need copy of Will. 4. Original Will is not lodged with the court. Need original Will filed & endorsed copy filed within case BPB-17-002681. COMMENT/NOTE- 5. Request full authority & no bond. Minimum bond to be set at $300,000.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Will, Trust & Supplement...returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte? returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via SASE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: to petition for waiver of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: to Petition for waiver of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: to Petition for waiver of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Paragraph 18 re total compensation request exceed statutory compensation per Probate Code 10800 and CRC 7.705. 2. Need waiver of account from trustee. 3. Need proposed distribution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Waiver of accounting returned to attorney via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition for probate of Will and for Letters testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - 09/14/2017 MO: Petition for Probate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Copy of Will not attached to petition. Need copy of Will. 4. Original Will is not lodged with the court. Need original Will filed & endorsed copy filed within case BPB-17-002681. COMMENT/NOTE- 5. Request full authority & no bond. Minimum bond to be set at $300,000.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Will, Trust & Supplement...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte? returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTER, STEVEN