This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:51:58 (UTC).

MARY C PATTON LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 MARY C PATTON LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W., Kendall, Andrew, Stein, Cameryn and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2193

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

Stein, Cameryn

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HELM, LESTER

ETIENNE, JOSEPH F

Not Classified By Court

PATTON, MARY C

PATTON, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

VAN SCIVER, KURT D

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Objector: PATTON, JASON

Petition

Petition 05/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for Instructions to Distribute Asset to Beneficiaries

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 12/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Compliance hearing re: stipulation and order as to final trustee costs and attorney fees Note: Parties need an additional 90 days to finalize stipulation and order regarding final trustee costs and attorney's fees

Petition for Instructions

Petition for Instructions 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for instruction to sell trust asset, or in the alternative to distribute asset to beneficiaries; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner: ETIENNE, JOSEPH F

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for instruction...returned via AMS

Petition

PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND FOR INSTRUCTIONS [PROB. CODE 15660(d), 17200(b)(6), (10)] #2 on Calendar; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte 072715: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - EX PARTE PETITION TO APPOINT TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE [PROB. CODE 15660(D), 17200(B)(10)] MATTER TO BE HEARD IN DEPARTMENT 4; Parties Present Petitioner: HELM, LESTER; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Petition - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for instructions to distribute asset to beneficiaries Still no proof of notice to Dale Ray Thomason and/or Shaylene S. Patton-Tucker. 06/27/2019 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Compliance Hearing RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO FINAL TRUSTEE COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES No stipulation filed. 06/27/2019 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of A. Palla ISO Reply to Objection to Petition to Distribute

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Reply - Comment: Reply to Unverified Objection to Petition for Instruction to Distribute Asset to Beneficiaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Objection/Opposition (Probate) - Comment: to petition for instruction to distribute asset to beneficiaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Status Conference - Case Status Conference 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Objector: PATTON, JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Order to continue hearings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation to Continue Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 7/27/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 11/5/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Kurt Van Sciver in support of Ex Parte Petition to appoint Temporary Successor Trustee [Prob. Code 15660(d), 17200(b)(10)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Points and Authorities - Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Ex Parte Petition to appoint Temporary Successor Trustee [Prob. Code 15660(d), 17200(b)(10)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Ex Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Ex Parte Petition to appoint Temporary Successor Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 11/5/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Ex Parte...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Ex Parte...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Probate Documents - Requested By: HELM, LESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Petition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to appoint Successor Trustee and for Instructions [Probate code 15660(d), 17200(b)(6), (10)]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.