This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 08:46:18 (UTC).

MARY ANN MILLER AND ANGELA MILLER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS HEIRS OF AND SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO ROSEMARY MILLER, DECEASED VS ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 MARY ANN MILLER AND ANGELA MILLER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS HEIRS OF AND SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO ROSEMARY MILLER, DECEASED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1067

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARY ANN MILLER AND ANGELA MILLER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS HEIRS OF AND SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO ROSEMARY MILLER, DECEASED

Defendants

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

BRIUS LLC

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI BENYAHOU

Defendant Attorney

SO JENNIFER G

 

Court Documents

Declaration

05/15/2023: Declaration

Notice of Motion

05/15/2023: Notice of Motion

Stipulation and Order

04/19/2023: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

03/21/2023: Stipulation and Order

Declaration

03/03/2023: Declaration

Declaration

03/03/2023: Declaration

Notice of Motion

03/03/2023: Notice of Motion

Declaration

03/03/2023: Declaration

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

12/02/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Reply

05/25/2023: Reply

Reply

05/25/2023: Reply

Reply

05/25/2023: Reply

Reply

05/25/2023: Reply

Reply

05/25/2023: Reply

Opposition

05/19/2023: Opposition

Opposition

05/19/2023: Opposition

Opposition

05/19/2023: Opposition

Opposition

05/19/2023: Opposition

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: DEFENDANTS??? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS??? COMPLAINT (Answers); Filed By: DEFENDANT - BRIUS LLC|DEFENDANT - CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC|DEFENDANT - ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC|DEFENDANT - THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF BAKERSFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Rockport Administrative Services, LLC, via subservice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC dba THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF BAKERSFIELD, via subservice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Citrus Wellness Center, LLC, via subservice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Brius LLC, via subservice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Proof of Service x 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/22/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARY ANN MILLER AND ANGELA MILLER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS HEIRS OF AND SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO ROSEMARY MILLER, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARY ANN MILLER AND ANGELA MILLER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS HEIRS OF AND SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO ROSEMARY MILLER, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MARY ANN MILLER AND ANGELA MILLER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS HEIRS OF AND SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO ROSEMARY MILLER, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less