This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:19:37 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS WALKER

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, JOSE

Defendants

CLARK, ALLISON MARIE

WALKER, WAYNE IRWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN, WILLIAM R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice, entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.