Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:58 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS MARTINEZ (C)

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 MARTINEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARTINEZ C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1672

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTINEZ, DELIA

Respondent

MARTINEZ, LUIS

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 06/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 03/05/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 03/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 1/17/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 06/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 03/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 03/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 1/17/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING RE: FAMILY CENTERED CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG 3/05/19 DIV. C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • At Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less