Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 09:50:35 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS MARIN

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 MARTINEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0155

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARTINEZ, MOISES BRAVO

MARTINEZ, MOISES MARIN

Respondent

MARIN, AFRICA BRAVO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: MARTINEZ, MOISES MARIN; MARIN, AFRICA BRAVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS ON: 4/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Default Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: MARTINEZ, MOISES MARIN; Served: 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less