This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 00:36:38 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS HAMPF ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAMPF. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0679

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIGUEL ANGEL RENDON MARTINEZ, A.K.A. JESUS ESTRADA

Defendants

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS

HAMPF, BRETT WILLIAM

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC

HAMPF, BRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PALACIOS, VICTOR S

ELY, GEOFFREY M

Defendant Attorneys

HAMMOND, BROOKE S

VAUDREUIL, COURTNEY E

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/15/2019: Case Management Conference Amended 10/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 09/10/2019

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Future Case Management Conference date is incorrect. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Servivce rejected: Please remove pages 3 and 4. They are duplicates of the Proof of Service. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Victor Palacios; Re:Copy of Summons; Reason:This is a duplicate, the original was filed on 03/14/2019.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: AS TO DEFENDANT BRETT WILLIAM HAMPF

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Fifth Rejection, per phone conversation on 6/27/19 with Evelyn at the Law Office of Victor S. Palacios, filing is being rejected for the fifth time, proof of service needs to be corrected.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Fourth Rejection, per phone conversation with Victor Palacio's Office the proof of service needs to be corrected.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Victor Palacios Re: Notice of Association of Counsel, Third rejection; Proof of Service has no signature. If proof of service requires a Court stamp, please file separate from Notice of Association. Also documents need to be served on other parties and not the Court as it is listed on item number 5. Please correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Association of Attorney rejected: Diana Sanchez is not a named party inthis case. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Victor Palacios Re: Notice of Association of Counsel and Proof of Service, per phone conversation with Attorney Victor Palacios office on 06/11/19, Notice of Association is missing signature from associating attorney. Proof of Service has wrong case number listed. As of 10/01/2018 we are mandatory e-file. Please correct and resubmit via e-file.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Victor Palacios; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Document is scanned in sideways (Landscape orientation was chosen instead of Portrait)

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/27/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 4 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: FCMC & CT 8/3/20; TE 4 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/15/2019: Case Management Conference Amended 10/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trus refund for $435 to Courtney E Vaudreuil. Completed on 09/23/19. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Future Case Management Conference date is incorrect. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: AS TO DEFENDANT BRETT WILLIAM HAMPF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 09/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Servivce rejected: Please remove pages 3 and 4. They are duplicates of the Proof of Service. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Association of Attorney rejected: Diana Sanchez is not a named party inthis case. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Victor Palacios Re: Notice of Association of Counsel and Proof of Service, per phone conversation with Attorney Victor Palacios office on 06/11/19, Notice of Association is missing signature from associating attorney. Proof of Service has wrong case number listed. As of 10/01/2018 we are mandatory e-file. Please correct and resubmit via e-file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Defenant Wonderful Orchards; Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: By Wonderful Citrus LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Victor Palacios; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Document is scanned in sideways (Landscape orientation was chosen instead of Portrait)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/17/2019; Served: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/27/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAUDREUIL COURTNEY E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMOND, BROOKE S