This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:49:34 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS GRIJALVA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 MARTINEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRIJALVA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3120

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, MARTHA

Defendant

GRIJALVA, ELMER

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

Small Claims Trial 05/23/2017: Small Claims Trial 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service; Comment: AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS RECEIVED 3/8/17 AND TAKEN TO EXHIBIT ROOM; Parties Present Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, MARTHA

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MARTINEZ, MARTHA; Awarded Against: GRIJALVA, ELMER; Amount; Damages: $2,000.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $2090.00; Comment: COURT COSTS ARE TO BE PAID DIRECTLY TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Debtor's Examination - Small Claims Trial 05/23/2017: Small Claims Trial 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service; Comment: AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Examination (Small Claims) AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA Hearing Date: 12/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Department/Division:12 RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "M"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Debtor's Examination - Small Claims Trial 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service; Comment: AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Affidavit - Comment: OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for - Comment: Examination (Small Claims) AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA RETURNED VIA PRO PER *M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO ELMER GRIJALVA BY SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Subpoenaed Records Received - Comment: BUREAU OF AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR 03/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: TRIAL CONTINUED TO 5/23/17 FROM 3/17/17 AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. RETURNED VIA PRO PER *M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: TRIAL CONTINUED TO 3/17/2017 FROM 1/25/2017 AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. RETURNED VIA PRO PER *M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MARTINEZ, MARTHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK AS TO MARTHA MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO MARTHA MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "M"

    Read MoreRead Less