This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:48 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS CATANO ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 MARTINEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CATANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3086

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, MICHAEL A

Defendants

CATANO GARCIA, ANISSA CAMERINA

CATANO, LUIS

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

01/20/17 MO; SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, MICHAEL A; Defendant: CATANO, LUIS; Defendant: CATANO GARCIA, ANISSA CAMERINA

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: CATANO, LUIS; CATANO GARCIA, ANISSA CAMERINA; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 01/20/17 MO; SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, MICHAEL A; Defendant: CATANO, LUIS; Defendant: CATANO GARCIA, ANISSA CAMERINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO ANISSA CAMERINA CATANO GARCIA BY SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO LUIS CATANO BY SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MARTINEZ, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "M"

    Read MoreRead Less