This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 20:00:15 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS AGUIRRE

Case Summary

On 06/25/2013 MARTINEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AGUIRRE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7114

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, MARBELLA

Defendants

AGUIRRE, ALFREDO

HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: MAILED 9/4/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARBELLA MARTINEZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $855.00 COSTS 50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ALFREDO AGUIRRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES IN PRO PER BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • Docket853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for MARTINEZ, (PL-1). Received from MARBELLA MARTINEZ. Receipt #724960 for amount of $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 775

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEATING AND AIR INC. is a litigant