This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:37:55 (UTC).

MARTINEZ ET AL VS COX ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COX. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1008

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ, ELVA

MARTINEZ, ASHANTI

MARTINEZ, HECTOR

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TREJO, BENNY

TREJO SANTOS, PEDRO

COX, DONALD ANTHONY

SANTOS, PEDRO TREJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRILL, THOMAS A

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GARCIA, MANUEL

DANIELS, DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: MANUEL GARCIA FOR: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL REASON: DUPLICATE. DISMISSAL PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 6/26/18.

Ruling

Minute Order 6/12/18: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRILL, THOMAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: BRILL, THOMAS A; Plaintiff; Attorney: BRILL, THOMAS A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER. FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED FOR EACH PARTY ANSWERING.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 7 DAYS FCMC 09/21/18 MSC 08/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: TRJ 10/01/18 T/E 7 MSC 08/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to Complaint Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: MANUEL GARCIA FOR: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL REASON: DUPLICATE. DISMISSAL PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 6/26/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: As to the Cross-Complaint of Benny Trejo and Pedro Santos Trejo Filed 10/18/17 - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice - as to PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ONLY-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO BENNY TREJO, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO DONALD ANTHONY COX, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Pedro Trejo Santos. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: APPOINTING HECTOR MARTINEZ AS GAL FOR ASHANTI MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/21/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/20/2017; Served: 06/10/2017; Served: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less