This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:28:43 (UTC).

MARTINEZ ET AL VS BASS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BASS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2354

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PELAYO, ROSA MARIA

MARTINEZ, LUIS FERNANDO RAMIREZ

ROJAS, JUAN

Defendants

BASS, KENNIS DEE

BASS, JACQUELINE

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P., A CORPORATION

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAY, DAVID C

Defendant Attorneys

BRONSTEIN, JOHN D

WARD, GARTH N

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 10/07/2019: Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 03/15/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 01/29/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Answer to Complaint

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BRONSTEIN, JOHN D; Defendant; Attorney: BRONSTEIN, JOHN D

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/23/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Re: 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 10/07/2019: Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Order to Show Cause re Dismissal currently set for July 23, 2019 in Department "11", in the above-entitled Court, be continued ninety (90) days, to October 21, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS JURY REQUESTED BY BOTH SIDES - PARTIES TO POST FEES W/IN TEN DAYS OF TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: It is hereby ordered that: The Order to Show Cause re Dismissal currently set for April 23, 2019 in Department "11", in the above-entitled Court, be continued ninety (90) days, to July 23, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 5/13/19 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 8 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/15/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury - Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: General Denial/Answer to Complaint AS TO Defendant Penske Truck Leasing CO. L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/19/2017; Served: 12/19/2017; Served: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/23/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less