Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:43 (UTC).

MARTIN VS SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0440

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN, MIRIAM

Defendant

SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREWS, BRIAN KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO C.R.C 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to entire action. Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, AS TO, SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS. 3B IS INCOMPLETE. SPECIFY WHAT ENTITY OR IF AN AUTHORIZED AGENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less