Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:01:06 (UTC).

MARTIN ROEFER VS THOMPSON, II

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 MARTIN ROEFER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THOMPSON, II. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0669

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROEFER, MARTIN J.

Defendant

THOMPSON, II, WILLIAM R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOYA, THOMAS A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ROEFER, MARTIN J.; Awarded Against: THOMPSON, II, WILLIAM R.; Amount; Damages: $39,500.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $3,558.25; Attorney Fees: $1,168.75; Costs: $479.50; Total: $44706.50; Party: Names: ROEFER, MARTIN J.; THOMPSON, II, WILLIAM R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Returned Via SAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: SUMMARY OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF, MARTIN J ROEFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: OF THOMAS A LOYA RE: PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO WILLIAM R THOMPSON II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to William R. Thompson II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/30/15 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY THOMAS A. LOYA CMC 2-8-16 @ 815AM D17

    Read MoreRead Less