Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:55 (UTC).

MARTIN PRADO VS CISNEROS

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 MARTIN PRADO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CISNEROS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0465

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRADO, MARTIN

Defendant

CISNEROS, MARIA DEL ROSARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, RONALD S

Defendant Attorney

DULCICH, JOHN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY JOHN S. DULCICH, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: On Complaint entire action dismissed without prejudice. Filed by Ronald S. Sims, Esq Endorsed copy returned via Attorney's Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MARIA DEL ROSARIO CISNEROS; PERSONAL SERVICE ON 7/31/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MESSENGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.100 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less