This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 04:28:34 (UTC).

MARSHALL VS MARSHALL JR.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 MARSHALL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARSHALL JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARSHALL, SAMANTHA

Respondent

MARSHALL JR., JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Parties Present Petitioner: MARSHALL, SAMANTHA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner DIV B: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Parties Present Petitioner: MARSHALL, SAMANTHA; Respondent: MARSHALL JR., JAMES

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner DIV C: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: MARSHALL, SAMANTHA; Respondent: MARSHALL JR., JAMES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Parties Present Petitioner: MARSHALL, SAMANTHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner DIV C: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Parties Present Petitioner: MARSHALL, SAMANTHA; Respondent: MARSHALL JR., JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner DIV C: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: MARSHALL, SAMANTHA; Respondent: MARSHALL JR., JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Notice and Service of Request for - Comment: Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Notice and Service of Request for - Comment: Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Request for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.